CO HB1400 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Passed on June 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-07 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Passed on June 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-07 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning matters related to a procedural requirement for state enterprises.
Title
Procedural Requirements For State Enterprises
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-11 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 46 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 51 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-04 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1400 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-02 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 49 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-28 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 22-1400 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 51 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-04 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1400 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-02 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 49 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-28 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 22-1400 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-07 | Governor Signed | |
2022-05-31 | Sent to the Governor | |
2022-05-31 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2022-05-27 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2022-05-11 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2022-05-10 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-05-09 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2022-05-04 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2022-05-02 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Appropriations |
2022-05-02 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-04-29 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2022-04-28 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2022-04-25 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance |