CO HB1400 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-30 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the temporary reallocation of limited gaming tax revenues to address recovery following the 2020 budget crisis.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Temporary Modification Of Limited Gaming Tax Revenue Allocation

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 23 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-04 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1400 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-03 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 46 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1400 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-30 Governor Signed
2020-06-29 Sent to the Governor
2020-06-29HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2020-06-29SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2020-06-06SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-06-05SenateSenate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
2020-06-04SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2020-06-03SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Appropriations
2020-06-03HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-06-02HouseHouse Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2020-06-01HouseHouse Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor
2020-05-29HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over to 06/01/2020 - No Amendments
2020-05-27HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2020-05-26HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Appropriations

Subjects


Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb20-1400
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1400_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1400_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1400_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1400_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1400_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1400_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/9d5792b4e52c72b287258575006cd517-hb20-1400-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb20-1400vote59437e
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/12b21f59a01adc6f8725857d0052647a-hb20-1400-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb20-1400vote5990b5

Bill Comments

feedback