CO HB1400 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-18 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-18 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning an increase in fees paid by stationary sources of air pollutants, and, in connection therewith, prioritizing the use of the revenues generated by the fee increases to reduce permit processing times and making an appropriation.
Title
Increase Fees Stationary Sources Air Pollutants
Sponsors
Rep. KC Becker [D] | Rep. Hugh McKean [R] | Sen. Ray Scott [R] | Sen. Cheri Jahn [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-07 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 57 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 64 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 30 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1400, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-05-02 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 18-1400 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-27 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 57 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.003 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-25 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1400, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1400, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 18-1400, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - House - House Finance: Adopt amendment L.001 [Attachment K]. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2018-04-23 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 18-1400, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 64 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 30 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1400, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-05-02 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 18-1400 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-27 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 57 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.003 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-25 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1400, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1400, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 18-1400, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - House - House Finance: Adopt amendment L.001 [Attachment K]. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2018-04-23 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 18-1400, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-18 | Governor Signed | |
2018-05-16 | Sent to the Governor | |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2018-05-15 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2018-05-07 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2018-05-04 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |
2018-04-27 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-04-26 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2018-04-25 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2018-04-23 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2018-04-18 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance |