CO HB1399 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-1)
Status: Vetoed on May 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-27 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-27 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning consumer protection relating to music therapy services.
Title
Music Therapist Title Protection
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 23 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-02 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 22-1399 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-29 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 45 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer House Bill 22-1399 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer House Bill 22-1399 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-02 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 22-1399 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-29 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 45 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer House Bill 22-1399 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer House Bill 22-1399 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-27 | Governor Vetoed | |
2022-05-27 | Sent to the Governor | |
2022-05-27 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2022-05-26 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-05-04 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2022-05-03 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2022-05-02 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2022-04-29 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services |
2022-04-29 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-04-28 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2022-04-27 | House | House Committee on Health & Insurance Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2022-04-25 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Health & Insurance |