CO HB1398 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-07 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-07 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Species Conservation Trust Fund
Title
Species Conservation Trust Fund
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-05-04 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW and consent calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-04-28 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 10-1398 to the Committee on Appropriations, without amendment (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-16 - House - FINAL VOTE - cow (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-14 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 10-1398 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2010-04-28 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 10-1398 to the Committee on Appropriations, without amendment (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-16 - House - FINAL VOTE - cow (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-14 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 10-1398 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-07 | Governor Action - Signed | |
2010-05-25 | Sent to the Governor | |
2010-05-25 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | |
2010-05-25 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2010-05-07 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2010-05-06 | Senate Second Reading Passed | |
2010-05-04 | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2010-04-28 | Senate Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources Refer Unamended to Appropriations | |
2010-04-23 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture and Natural Resources + Appropriations | |
2010-04-22 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2010-04-21 | House Second Reading Passed | |
2010-04-20 | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2010-04-16 | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2010-04-14 | House Committee on Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources Refer Unamended to Appropriations | |
2010-04-08 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources + Appropriations |