CO HB1396 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-24 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-24 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning creation of an advanced placement exam fee grant program in the department of education, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Advanced Placement Exam Fee Grant Program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 26 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1396 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 18-1396 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 43 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1396, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-23 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 18-1396 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1396 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 18-1396 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 43 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1396, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-23 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 18-1396 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-24 | Governor Signed | |
2018-05-18 | Sent to the Governor | |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2018-05-18 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |
2018-05-01 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-04-30 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2018-04-30 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2018-04-23 | House | House Committee on Education Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2018-04-17 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Education |