CO HB1385 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-27 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-27 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the implementation of the Colorado operations resource engine upgrade project.
Title
Colorado Operations Resource Engine Upgrade Project
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-06 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1385 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-06 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 22-1385 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-02 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 43 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-29 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1385 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-28 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 22-1385 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-21 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer House Bill 22-1385, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-21 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Adopt amendment L.004 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-21 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Adopt amendment L.003 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-21 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer House Bill 22-1385, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-06 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1385 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-06 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 22-1385 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-02 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 43 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-29 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1385 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-28 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 22-1385 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-21 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer House Bill 22-1385, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-21 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Adopt amendment L.004 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-21 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Adopt amendment L.003 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-21 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer House Bill 22-1385, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-27 | Governor Signed | |
2022-05-20 | Sent to the Governor | |
2022-05-20 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2022-05-20 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2022-05-09 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-05-06 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2022-05-06 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2022-05-06 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2022-05-02 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |
2022-05-02 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-04-29 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2022-04-29 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2022-04-28 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2022-04-21 | House | House Committee on Business Affairs & Labor Refer Amended to Finance |
2022-04-18 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs & Labor |