CO HB1381 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-29 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-29 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning operations related to the sale of medical marijuana in the regulated medical marijuana market, and, in connection therewith, moving from the seventy percent own source requirement to a one-year transition period of fifty percent own source requirement to an elimination of the own source requirement.
Title
Permissive Medical Marijuana Vertical Integration
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 18-1381 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-20 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 44 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-04-19 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.004) (Y: 22 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2018-04-16 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 18-1381 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 18-1381 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 18-1381 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-20 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 44 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-04-19 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.004) (Y: 22 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2018-04-16 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 18-1381 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 18-1381 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-29 | Governor Signed | |
2018-05-08 | Sent to the Governor | |
2018-05-07 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2018-05-07 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |
2018-04-20 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-04-19 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2018-04-16 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2018-04-11 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance |