CO HB1380 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Failed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Failed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the property-related expense assistance grants for low-income seniors and individuals with disabilities, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Grants For Property Tax Rent And Heat
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 18-1380 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Postpone House Bill 18-1380 indefinitely. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-27 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 37 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-25 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1380, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1380, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer House Bill 18-1380 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Postpone House Bill 18-1380 indefinitely. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-27 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 37 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-25 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1380, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1380, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer House Bill 18-1380 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-03 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2018-04-27 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-04-26 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2018-04-25 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2018-04-24 | House | House Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2018-04-11 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Public Health Care & Human Services |