CO HB1380 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 6 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-06 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 6 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-06 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Use Suppl OAP Health Fund For Medicaid
Title
Use Suppl OAP Health Fund For Medicaid
Sponsors
Rep. John Pommer [D] | Sen. Al White [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-06 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - cow (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-30 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-03-30 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-06 | Governor Action - Signed | |
2010-04-30 | Sent to the Governor | |
2010-04-30 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2010-04-28 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | |
2010-04-09 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2010-04-08 | Senate Second Reading Passed | |
2010-04-06 | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2010-04-05 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Appropriations | |
2010-04-01 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2010-03-31 | House Second Reading Passed | |
2010-03-30 | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2010-03-26 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Appropriations | |
2010-03-26 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Appropriations |