CO HB1377 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 47-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-31 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 47-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-31 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the creation of the connecting Coloradans experiencing homelessness with services, recovery care, and housing supports grant program, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Grant Program Providing Responses To Homelessness
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-06 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1377 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-05 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 22-1377 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-02 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 41 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-29 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1377, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-29 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.005 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-29 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Refer House Bill 22-1377, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment F). (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment D). (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Refer House Bill 22-1377, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-06 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1377 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-05 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 22-1377 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-02 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 41 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-29 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1377, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-29 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.005 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-29 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Refer House Bill 22-1377, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment F). (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment D). (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Refer House Bill 22-1377, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-31 | Governor Signed | |
2022-05-20 | Sent to the Governor | |
2022-05-20 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2022-05-20 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2022-05-09 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-05-06 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2022-05-06 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2022-05-02 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |
2022-05-02 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-04-29 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2022-04-29 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2022-04-26 | House | House Committee on Transportation & Local Government Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2022-04-18 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Local Government |