CO HB1377 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 8 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-08 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 8 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-08 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Task Force Digital Images Of Child Abuse Neglect
Title
Task Force Digital Images Of Child Abuse Neglect
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-05 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Amendment (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-20 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-20 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-20 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-20 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1377, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-20 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-20 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1377, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-01 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-22 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1377 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Amendment (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-20 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-20 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-20 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-20 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1377, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-20 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-20 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1377, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-01 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-22 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1377 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-08 | House | Governor Signed |
2016-05-18 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2016-05-17 | House | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2016-05-17 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2016-05-05 | House | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2016-05-02 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2016-04-25 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services |
2016-04-01 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2016-03-29 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over to 04/012016 - No Amendments |
2016-03-28 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2016-03-22 | House | House Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2016-03-16 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Public Health Care & Human Services |