CO HB1377 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-19 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-19 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Shared Renewable Generation Facilities For REAs
Title
Shared Renewable Generation Facilities For REAs
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1377 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-30 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-30 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-30 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1377, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-30 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-30 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-30 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1377, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-19 | House | Governor Signed |
2015-05-14 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2015-05-13 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2015-05-13 | House | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2015-05-01 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |
2015-05-01 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2015-04-30 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2015-04-30 | House | House Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2015-04-29 | House | House Committee on Transportation & Energy Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only |
2015-04-22 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Energy |