CO HB1376 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-30 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-30 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the modification of transportation funding mechanisms, and, in connection therewith, delaying from the November 2020 general election until the November 2021 statewide election the requirement that a ballot issue seeking approval for the issuance of transportation revenue anticipation notes be submitted to the voters of the state, amending the ballot issue to reduce the amount of notes authorized to be issued, eliminating specified scheduled general fund transfers to the state highway fund, reducing the amount of general fund money dedicated to make lease-purchase agreement payments due during state fiscal years 2020-21 and 2021-22, repealing department of transportation rule-making and reporting requirements relating to motor vehicles used for certain types of commercial purposes, and making and reducing appropriations.
Title
Modify Transportation Funding Mechanisms
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-12 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 33 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-06-12 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 33 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-06-12 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 38 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 23 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1376 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.003 (Y: 5 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-06-08 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 20-1376 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 20-1376 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-05 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 43 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-03 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1376, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-03 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1376, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 20-1376 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Refer House Bill 20-1376 to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-12 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 33 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-06-12 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 38 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 23 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1376 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.003 (Y: 5 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-06-08 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 20-1376 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 20-1376 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-05 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 43 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-03 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1376, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-03 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1376, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 20-1376 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Refer House Bill 20-1376 to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-30 | Governor Signed | |
2020-06-29 | Sent to the Governor | |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2020-06-29 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2020-06-12 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2020-06-11 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-06-09 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2020-06-09 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2020-06-08 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2020-06-06 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |
2020-06-05 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-06-04 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2020-06-03 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2020-05-28 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2020-05-27 | House | House Committee on Transportation & Local Government Refer Unamended to Finance |
2020-05-26 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Local Government |