CO HB1374 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-24 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-24 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning controlled maintenance needs of real property acquired through a lease-purchase agreement.
Title
Controlled Maintenance Financed Acquired Prop
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-03 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 44 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 50 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Senate Finance: Adopt amendment L.005 [Attachment A]. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 18-1374, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-20 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 42 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - House - House Finance: Adopt amendment L.001 [Attachment C]. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-16 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 18-1374, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 18-1374, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 50 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Senate Finance: Adopt amendment L.005 [Attachment A]. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 18-1374, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-20 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 42 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - House - House Finance: Adopt amendment L.001 [Attachment C]. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-16 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 18-1374, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 18-1374, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-24 | Governor Signed | |
2018-05-16 | Sent to the Governor | |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2018-05-15 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2018-05-03 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2018-04-26 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |
2018-04-20 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-04-19 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2018-04-16 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2018-04-09 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance |