CO HB1374 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-05 - Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Required Notice & Disclosures Freestanding ERs

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Required Notice & Disclosures Freestanding ERs

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-05-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1374 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-05-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Postpone House Bill 16-1374 indefinitely using a reversal of the previous roll call. There was no objection to the use of the reverse roll call, therefore, the bill was postponed indefinitely (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1374 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-05-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Postpone House Bill 16-1374 indefinitely using a reversal of the previous roll call. There was no objection to the use of the reverse roll call, therefore, the bill was postponed indefinitely (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-14 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment H) (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-14 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment I) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-14 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1374, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-14 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1374, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-05SenateSenate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
2016-05-04SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
2016-05-04HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2016-05-03HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Floor
2016-05-02HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over to 05/03/2016 - No Amendments
2016-04-14HouseHouse Committee on Health, Insurance, & Environment Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2016-03-16HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Health, Insurance, & Environment

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/4F0B1A1ED7044ECD87257F240066846B?Open
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/4F0B1A1ED7044ECD87257F240066846B/$FILE/1374_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/4F0B1A1ED7044ECD87257F240066846B/$FILE/1374hie_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/4F0B1A1ED7044ECD87257F240066846B/$FILE/1374_eng.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/4F0B1A1ED7044ECD87257F240066846B/$FILE/1374_ren.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/F4AC64FECE2E62DF87257F96000C03B2
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/F4AC64FECE2E62DF87257F96000C03B2
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/E63420723B331A0587257F96000A93F9
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/1108C66325A1FD4487257F96000AD49D
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/518AE307933E89F987257FAA0070A366
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/30E58131266DD44487257FAA00709441
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/csljournals.nsf/(jouhse)/B6E013B81CE2868E87257FA900526200/$FILE/My04.pdf#1216
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/F3A7CA1C59B22E4F87257FBC005AF576
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/CFA9E18AA89CC5A787257FBC005AE25D

Bill Comments

feedback