CO HB1374 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-25 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-25 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Parole Changes Evidence-based Practices
Title
Parole Changes Evidence-based Practices
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-05-07 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-05-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 10-1374 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-23 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-04-15 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 10-1374, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations with a favorable recommendation (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 10-1374 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-23 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-04-15 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 10-1374, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations with a favorable recommendation (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-25 | Governor Action - Signed | |
2010-05-24 | Sent to the Governor | |
2010-05-24 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2010-05-20 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | |
2010-05-12 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2010-05-12 | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass | |
2010-05-11 | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-05-07 | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2010-05-05 | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to Appropriations | |
2010-04-29 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary + Appropriations | |
2010-04-28 | House Third Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-04-27 | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-04-26 | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2010-04-23 | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2010-04-15 | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Appropriations | |
2010-03-23 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary + Appropriations |