CO HB1368 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Passed on June 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-08 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Passed on June 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-08 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning opportunities for persons to access community corrections programs.
Title
Community Corrections Programs Access
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 27 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-28 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 22-1368 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 42 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 22-1368, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-28 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 22-1368 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 42 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 22-1368, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-08 | Governor Signed | |
2022-05-31 | Sent to the Governor | |
2022-05-31 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2022-05-27 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2022-05-02 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-04-29 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |
2022-04-25 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-04-22 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2022-04-21 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2022-04-20 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2022-04-11 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |