CO HB1366 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-05 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-05 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Expand Job Growth Tax Credit For Higher Ed Project
Title
Expand Job Growth Tax Credit For Higher Ed Project
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-04 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1366, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-04 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - J.001 w small cap GF The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-30 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1366 to the Committee on Finance (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-30 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1366 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment I) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-22 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment K) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-22 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Amendment J) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-22 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1366, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1366, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-04 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - J.001 w small cap GF The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-30 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1366 to the Committee on Finance (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-30 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1366 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment I) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-22 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment K) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-22 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Amendment J) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-22 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1366, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1366, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-05 | House | Governor Signed |
2015-05-18 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2015-05-18 | House | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2015-05-14 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2015-05-06 | House | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Unamended to Finance |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology |
2015-04-28 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2015-04-27 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2015-04-23 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2015-04-22 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2015-04-20 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance |