CO HB1365 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-06 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-06 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning an exemption from the prohibition against having electronic benefits transfer services available through an automated teller machine located on a liquor-licensed premises for an establishment licensed as a liquor-licensed drugstore.
Title
Liquor-licensed Drugstores Electronic Benefit Transfers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-05 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 17-1365 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - House - House Business Affairs and Labor: Refer House Bill 17-1365 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-05 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 17-1365 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - House - House Business Affairs and Labor: Refer House Bill 17-1365 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-06 | Governor Signed | |
2017-05-22 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-19 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |
2017-05-02 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-05-01 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-04-27 | House | House Committee on Business Affairs and Labor Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2017-04-27 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs and Labor |