CO HB1363 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-05 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-05 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning an exemption from otherwise applicable requirements for financing from the Colorado new energy improvement district if a residential property owner is not seeking to subordinate the priority of existing mortgages.
Title
Exempt New Energy Requirement If Not Subordinate Lien
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-08 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 17-1363 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-05 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - House - House Transportation & Energy: Refer House Bill 17-1363, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - House - House Transportation & Energy: Refer House Bill 17-1363, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-05 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - House - House Transportation & Energy: Refer House Bill 17-1363, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - House - House Transportation & Energy: Refer House Bill 17-1363, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-05 | Governor Signed | |
2017-05-22 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-19 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |
2017-05-08 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-05-05 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2017-05-03 | House | House Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2017-04-26 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Energy |