CO HB1362 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-06 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Great-grandparent Visitation Of Grandchildren

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Great-grandparent Visitation Of Grandchildren

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2014-06-06HouseGovernor Signed
2014-05-14HouseSent to the Governor
2014-05-14HouseSigned by the President of the Senate
2014-05-14HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2014-05-02HouseHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2014-04-30SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2014-04-29SenateSenate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2014-04-28SenateSenate Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2014-04-22SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary
2014-04-22HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2014-04-21HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
2014-04-17HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2014-04-15HouseHouse Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2014-04-07HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Public Health Care & Human Services

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/14DE71B73167EB4C87257C3600755A3F?Open
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/14DE71B73167EB4C87257C3600755A3F/$FILE/1362_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/14DE71B73167EB4C87257C3600755A3F/$FILE/1362_eng.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/14DE71B73167EB4C87257C3600755A3F/$FILE/1362_ren.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/14DE71B73167EB4C87257C3600755A3F/$FILE/1362sjud_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/14DE71B73167EB4C87257C3600755A3F/$FILE/1362_rev.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/14DE71B73167EB4C87257C3600755A3F/$FILE/1362_rer.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/14DE71B73167EB4C87257C3600755A3F/$FILE/1362_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2014A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/116FBE0D343B603087257CBB008176C5
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2014A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/D8E7B3E4AF18049487257CC80073A2AF
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2014A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/A3C780E7AEC7CB4287257CC800738B7F

Bill Comments

feedback