CO HB1361 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 6 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-06 - Senate Committee on Finance Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Patient Choice In Pharmacy

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Patient Choice In Pharmacy

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-05-06 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.006 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-05-06 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1361, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-05-06 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.008 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-05-06 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Postpone House Bill 16-1361 indefinitely using a reversal of the previous roll call. There was no objection to the use of the reverse roll call, therefore, the bill was postponed indefinitely (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-05-06 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.006 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-05-06 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1361, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-05-06 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.008 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-05-06 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Postpone House Bill 16-1361 indefinitely using a reversal of the previous roll call. There was no objection to the use of the reverse roll call, therefore, the bill was postponed indefinitely (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-25 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1361 to the Committee on Finance (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-25 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1361 to the Committee on Finance (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-14 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-07 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 33 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment K) (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment J) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1361, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-06SenateSenate Committee on Finance Postpone Indefinitely
2016-04-25SenateSenate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to Finance
2016-04-14SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs + Finance
2016-04-14HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2016-04-08HouseHouse Third Reading Laid Over to 04/14/2016 - No Amendments
2016-04-07HouseHouse Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
2016-04-05HouseHouse Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2016-03-16HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Public Health Care & Human Services

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/FB0C05E132604A3A87257F530078A4C8?Open
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/FB0C05E132604A3A87257F530078A4C8/$FILE/1361_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/FB0C05E132604A3A87257F530078A4C8/$FILE/1361phc_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/FB0C05E132604A3A87257F530078A4C8/$FILE/1361_eng.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/FB0C05E132604A3A87257F530078A4C8/$FILE/1361_ren.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/9683829EC333A63087257F8D000A1F6D
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/csljournals.nsf/(jouhse)/4665D6684262FC5887257F8E005218A0/$FILE/Ap07.pdf#731
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/csljournals.nsf/(jouhse)/6AB377213BECB5D187257F9500545AAF/$FILE/Ap14.pdf#810
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/E74B2389EACF3E0A87257F8D0007C8A5
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/BF7B2D581BC0398D87257F8D00080838
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/957312002A21F90C87257FA000796330
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/90921C1C712E50FD87257FAB005FD334
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/919D646B1159354187257FAB005EEA6C
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/CC246FBAB89A4A5D87257FAB005F0797
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/5F74921FE42E26FC87257FAB005EFE61
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/957312002A21F90C87257FA000796330
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/90921C1C712E50FD87257FAB005FD334
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/919D646B1159354187257FAB005EEA6C
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/CC246FBAB89A4A5D87257FAB005F0797
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/5F74921FE42E26FC87257FAB005EFE61

Bill Comments

feedback