CO HB1358 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 5 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-05 - House Committee on Appropriations Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 5 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-05 - House Committee on Appropriations Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Protect Privacy Of Substance Use Disorder Patients
Title
Protect Privacy Of Substance Use Disorder Patients
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Layover to May 15tth House Bill 16-1358 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Layover to May 15tth House Bill 16-1358 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment B) (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment B) (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1358, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1358, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Layover to May 15tth House Bill 16-1358 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment B) (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment B) (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1358, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1358, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-05 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Postpone Indefinitely |
2016-04-26 | House | House Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2016-04-05 | House | House Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only |
2016-03-11 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Public Health Care & Human Services |