CO HB1355 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-05 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-05 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the use of money from the county block grant temporary assistance for needy families program for child care quality improvement activities.
Title
County Block Grant Money To Child Care Quality Programs
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-05 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 17-1355 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - House - House Health, Insurance, & Environment: Refer House Bill 17-1355 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-05 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 17-1355 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - House - House Health, Insurance, & Environment: Refer House Bill 17-1355 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-05 | Governor Signed | |
2017-05-22 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-19 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |
2017-05-02 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-05-01 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-04-27 | House | House Committee on Health, Insurance, & Environment Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2017-04-24 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Health, Insurance, & Environment |