CO HB1354 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 45-0)
Status: Passed on June 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-08 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 45-0)
Status: Passed on June 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-08 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning mental health in workers' compensation cases.
Title
Protecting Injured Workers' Mental Health Records
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-10 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 55 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 51 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 24 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-02 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer House Bill 22-1354, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-02 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer House Bill 22-1354, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 53 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-21 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1354 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-12 - House - House Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 22-1354, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-12 - House - House Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment R). (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-12 - House - House Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment Q). (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-12 - House - House Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 22-1354, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 51 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 24 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-02 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer House Bill 22-1354, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-02 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer House Bill 22-1354, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 53 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-21 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1354 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-12 - House - House Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 22-1354, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-12 - House - House Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment R). (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-12 - House - House Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment Q). (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-12 - House - House Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 22-1354, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-08 | Governor Signed | |
2022-06-01 | Sent to the Governor | |
2022-06-01 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2022-06-01 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2022-05-10 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2022-05-09 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-05-04 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2022-05-03 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2022-05-02 | Senate | Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology |
2022-04-25 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-04-22 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2022-04-21 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2022-04-21 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2022-04-12 | House | House Committee on Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2022-03-31 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services |