CO HB1353 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-30 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-30 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the creation of a grant program to reimburse local governments for costs associated with the provision of defense counsel to certain defendants at their first appearances in municipal courts, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Defense Counsel In Municipal Court Grant Program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-07 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 64 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 50 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 31 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.006 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1353, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 18-1353 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-27 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 46 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-25 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1353, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1353, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 18-1353 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 50 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 31 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.006 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1353, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 18-1353 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-27 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 46 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-25 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1353, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1353, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 18-1353 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-30 | Governor Signed | |
2018-05-22 | Sent to the Governor | |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2018-05-22 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2018-05-07 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2018-05-04 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2018-05-04 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs + Appropriations |
2018-04-27 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-04-26 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2018-04-25 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2018-04-12 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2018-04-03 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |