CO HB1353 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning implementing medicaid initiatives that create higher value in the medicaid program leading to better health outcomes for medicaid clients, and, in connection therewith, continuing the implementation of the accountable care collaborative and authorizing performance-based provider payments.
Title
Implement Medicaid Delivery & Payment Initiatives
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - House - House: Concur in Senate Amendment (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-05 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-05 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.017 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-05 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.018 (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-05 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 17-1353, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-28 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer House Bill 17-1353, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer House Bill 17-1353, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - House - House: Concur in Senate Amendment (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-05 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-05 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.017 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-05 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.018 (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-05 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 17-1353, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-28 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer House Bill 17-1353, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer House Bill 17-1353, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-23 | Governor Signed | |
2017-05-22 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-19 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-05-09 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Appropriations |
2017-04-28 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-04-27 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2017-04-25 | House | House Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2017-04-21 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Public Health Care & Human Services |