CO HB1352 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-05 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Naturopathic Doctor Formulary Changes

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Naturopathic Doctor Formulary Changes

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-04-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1352 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1352 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-05HouseGovernor Signed
2015-05-13HouseSent to the Governor
2015-05-13HouseSigned by the President of the Senate
2015-05-12HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2015-05-04SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2015-05-01SenateSenate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2015-04-29SenateSenate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2015-04-27SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services
2015-04-27HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2015-04-24HouseHouse Third Reading Laid Over to 04/27/2015 - No Amendments
2015-04-23HouseHouse Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2015-04-21HouseHouse Committee on Health, Insurance, & Environment Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2015-04-13HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Health, Insurance, & Environment

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/D19DC7C16B3541E187257E0C0055647C?Open
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/D19DC7C16B3541E187257E0C0055647C/$FILE/1352_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/D19DC7C16B3541E187257E0C0055647C/$FILE/1352_eng.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/D19DC7C16B3541E187257E0C0055647C/$FILE/1352_ren.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/D19DC7C16B3541E187257E0C0055647C/$FILE/1352_rev.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/D19DC7C16B3541E187257E0C0055647C/$FILE/1352_rer.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/D19DC7C16B3541E187257E0C0055647C/$FILE/1352_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/029D10304F377F5D87257E2E00630707
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2015A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/555758BF267BA02D87257E36006B1F51
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2015A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/23F74908D30B1AE787257E36006BBDFF

Bill Comments

feedback