CO HB1350 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-06 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the sales and use tax treatment of equipment used to manufacture new metal stock from scrap or end-of-life-cycle metals, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Machine Tool Sales Tax Exemption For Scrap Metal

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1350 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 18-1350 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 53 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-27 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-27 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1350, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 18-1350 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - House - House Business Affairs and Labor: Refer House Bill 18-1350 to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-06 Governor Signed
2018-05-18 Sent to the Governor
2018-05-18SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2018-05-17HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2018-05-04SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2018-05-03SenateSenate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
2018-05-03SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2018-05-02SenateSenate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2018-04-30SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance
2018-04-30HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2018-04-27HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2018-04-27HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2018-04-18HouseHouse Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2018-04-10HouseHouse Committee on Business Affairs and Labor Refer Unamended to Finance
2018-04-02HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs and Labor + Appropriations

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb18-1350
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_1350_01.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_1350_eng.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_1350_ren.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_1350_rev.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_1350_rer.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_1350_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hbus2018a2018-04-10t133158z-hb18-1350-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hfin2018a2018-04-18t111603z-hb18-1350-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/happ2018a2018-04-27t093937z-hb18-1350-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/happ2018a2018-04-27t093937z-hb18-1350-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb18-1350vote637ede
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/sfin2018a2018-05-02t134747z-hb18-1350-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/sapp2018a2018-05-03t083717z-hb18-1350-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb18-1350vote60f963

Bill Comments

feedback