CO HB1349 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 8 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-08 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Re-energize CO Renewable Elec For Parks

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Re-energize CO Renewable Elec For Parks

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-05-06 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - cow (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-05-04 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 10-1349 to the Committee on Appropriations, as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-16 - House - FINAL VOTE - cow (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 10-1349, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-06-08 Governor Action - Signed
2010-05-20 Sent to the Governor
2010-05-20 Signed by the President of the Senate
2010-05-19 Signed by the Speaker of the House
2010-05-12 House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2010-05-11 Senate Third Reading Passed
2010-05-10 Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments
2010-05-06 Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2010-05-04 Senate Committee on Local Government and Energy Refer Amended to Appropriations
2010-04-29 Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Local Government and Energy + Appropriations
2010-04-26 House Third Reading Passed
2010-04-23 House Second Reading Passed with Amendments
2010-04-20 House Second Reading Laid Over Daily
2010-04-16 House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2010-04-06 House Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Amended to Appropriations
2010-02-16 Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Energy + Appropriations

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2010a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/0B75D702CCF8BFE5872576A80027B5F0?Open
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2010a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/0B75D702CCF8BFE5872576A80027B5F0/$FILE/1349_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2010a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/0B75D702CCF8BFE5872576A80027B5F0/$FILE/1349teAPP.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2010a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/0B75D702CCF8BFE5872576A80027B5F0/$FILE/1349sloc_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2010a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/0B75D702CCF8BFE5872576A80027B5F0/$FILE/1349_eng.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2010a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/0B75D702CCF8BFE5872576A80027B5F0/$FILE/1349_ren.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2010a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/0B75D702CCF8BFE5872576A80027B5F0/$FILE/1349_rev.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2010a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/0B75D702CCF8BFE5872576A80027B5F0/$FILE/1349_rer.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2010a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/0B75D702CCF8BFE5872576A80027B5F0/$FILE/1349_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2010A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/93784EFE2874A180872576FD00735952
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2010A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/ECA57E3AFF790C56872577070057816A
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2010A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/2B019E18F98A7D55872577190075FA62
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2010A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/5B99B260E70517FB8725771B004E5A9A

Bill Comments

feedback