CO HB1348 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-30 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning families involved in the child welfare system, and, in connection therewith, prioritizing services and providing support for foster parents.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Child Welfare Information And Services

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-30 Governor Signed
2018-05-04 Sent to the Governor
2018-05-04SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2018-05-02HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2018-04-26SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2018-04-25SenateSenate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
2018-04-23SenateSenate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2018-04-17SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
2018-04-17HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2018-04-16HouseHouse Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
2018-04-13HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2018-04-10HouseHouse Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2018-04-02HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Public Health Care & Human Services

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb18-1348
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_1348_01.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_1348_eng.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_1348_ren.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_1348_rev.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_1348_rer.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_1348_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hphc2018a2018-04-10t133832z-hb18-1348-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb18-1348vote55ed24
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/ssa2018a2018-04-23t143748z-hb18-1348-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb18-1348vote576da6
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hphc2018a2018-04-10t133832z-hb18-1348-1-activity-vote-summary

Bill Comments

feedback