CO HB1348 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 8 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-08 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 8 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-08 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Increase Oversight Radioactive Materials
Title
Increase Oversight Radioactive Materials
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-21 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 10-1348, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-18 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 10-1348, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-18 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 10-1348, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-08 | Governor Action - Signed | |
2010-05-20 | Sent to the Governor | |
2010-05-20 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2010-05-19 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | |
2010-04-28 | Senate Third Reading Reconsidered | |
2010-04-28 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2010-04-28 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2010-04-28 | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass | |
2010-04-27 | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-04-26 | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2010-04-21 | Senate Committee on Business, Labor and Technology Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2010-04-13 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor and Technology | |
2010-04-05 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2010-04-01 | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-03-23 | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2010-03-18 | House Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2010-02-16 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Energy |