CO HB1344 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-20 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-20 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Fund Natl Western Ctr & Capitol Complex Projects
Title
Fund Natl Western Ctr & Capitol Complex Projects
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-24 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1344 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1344 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1344 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.005 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-15 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.004 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-15 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-15 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1344, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1344, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1344 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1344 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.005 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-15 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.004 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-15 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-15 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1344, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1344, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-20 | House | Governor Signed |
2015-05-14 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2015-05-13 | House | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2015-05-11 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2015-04-30 | House | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Senate Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2015-04-17 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy |
2015-04-17 | House | House Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2015-04-16 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2015-04-15 | House | House Committee on Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2015-04-08 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources |