CO HB1343 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-24 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-24 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the continuation of the "Colorado Veterans' Service-to-career Program", and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Veterans' Service-to-career Program
Sponsors
Sen. Pete Lee [D] | Rep. Terri Carver [R] | Sen. Kent Lambert [R] | Sen. Nancy Todd [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-07 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 50 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 48 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 29 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.005 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1343, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-05-01 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 18-1343 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-27 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 51 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1343, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-25 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1343, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - House - House Education: Adopt amendment L.003 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-04-11 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 18-1343, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 18-1343, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 48 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 29 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.005 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1343, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-05-01 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 18-1343 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-27 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 51 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1343, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-25 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1343, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - House - House Education: Adopt amendment L.003 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-04-11 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 18-1343, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 18-1343, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-24 | Governor Signed | |
2018-05-18 | Sent to the Governor | |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2018-05-18 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2018-05-07 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2018-05-04 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2018-04-27 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-04-26 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2018-04-25 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2018-04-11 | House | House Committee on Education Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2018-03-26 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Education |