CO HB1343 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-06 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Firefighter Peace Officer PTSD Work Comp Coverage

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Firefighter Peace Officer PTSD Work Comp Coverage

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-05-02 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved a conceptual amendment to Page 5 of the reengrossed bill, strike lines 13-22 and substitute a safety clause (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-05-02 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1343, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-25 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared Amendment L.018 (Attachment O) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-25 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared Amendment L.017 (Attachment N) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-25 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1343, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-23 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt severed section B of amendment L014 (Attachment D), which includes the first two lines of the amendment and then begins again on page 2, line 18 and ends on page 4, line 30 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-23 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt severed section A of amendment L.014 (Attachment D), which begins on page 1, line 1 and ends on page 2, line 17 (Y: 3 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-23 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1343, as amended, to the Committee on Legislative Council (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-23 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1343, as amended, to the Committee on Legislative Council (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-16 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1343, as amended, to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-16 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1343, as amended, to the Committee on Health, Insurance and Environment (Y: 4 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-16 - House - FINAL VOTE - Reconsider amendment L.006 (Attachment B) (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-04-16 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1343, as amended, to the Committee on Business, Labor, Economic, and Workforce Development (Y: 6 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-16 - House - FINAL VOTE - Postpone House Bill 14-1343 indefinitely (Y: 6 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-16 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1343, as amended, to the Committee on State Veterans and Military Affairs The motion passed on a vote of 9-4. (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2014-04-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 withdrawn The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment D) (Y: 4 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.006 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-06-06HouseGovernor Signed
2014-05-21HouseSent to the Governor
2014-05-20HouseSigned by the President of the Senate
2014-05-19HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2014-05-07HouseHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2014-05-06SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2014-05-05SenateSenate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2014-05-02SenateSenate Committee on Local Government Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2014-04-30SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Local Government
2014-04-30HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2014-04-29HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
2014-04-25HouseHouse Committee on Legislative Council Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2014-04-23HouseHouse Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended to Legislative Council
2014-04-16HouseHouse Committee on Local Government Refer Amended to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
2014-04-02HouseHouse Committee on Local Government Lay Over Amended
2014-03-24HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Local Government + Appropriations

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/A8CE9CE79574951A87257C700055C1F2?Open
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/A8CE9CE79574951A87257C700055C1F2/$FILE/1343_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/A8CE9CE79574951A87257C700055C1F2/$FILE/1343lg_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/A8CE9CE79574951A87257C700055C1F2/$FILE/1343sa.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/A8CE9CE79574951A87257C700055C1F2/$FILE/1343legc.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/A8CE9CE79574951A87257C700055C1F2/$FILE/1343_eng.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/A8CE9CE79574951A87257C700055C1F2/$FILE/1343_ren.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/A8CE9CE79574951A87257C700055C1F2/$FILE/1343sloc_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/A8CE9CE79574951A87257C700055C1F2/$FILE/1343_rev.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/A8CE9CE79574951A87257C700055C1F2/$FILE/1343_rer.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/A8CE9CE79574951A87257C700055C1F2/$FILE/1343_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2014A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/E5C421A9A02D688687257CAE00811AD3
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2014A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/4BD6847185AAE8C987257CAE00818616
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2014A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/40109489F263FF8287257CAE00815A60
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2014A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/2BC688D07A03019687257CAE008035D8
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2014A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/C49699F2E5B95CDA87257CBC006E527B
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2014A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/989109C1043AA2F887257CBC006E59AE
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2014A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/927AFB63C803E8EF87257CBC006F8C5D
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2014A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/827DF117CDD5A29787257CBC006B9EBE
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2014A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/7DFD000A07BD0BBE87257CBC006ECFD4
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2014A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/6A314F15A8ACDCA087257CBC006FD1E3
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2014A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/85235723B89961A087257CC3006BFCCB
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2014A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/90A562B12CFB57FE87257CC500689468
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2014A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/B2EB7C3EBECCC02587257CC50066411E
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2014A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/D074AD2D5DE04A4C87257CC500682D42
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2014A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/5CE82CEBADA54DF287257CC50068740F
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2014A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/79A776E8670BE6FE87257CC500660AEA
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2014A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/36772F775F8AAFE187257CC50065E62B
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2014A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/CFE2129ACFDE9FFC87257CCC0051ABF4
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2014A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/610EF0E1957E76BE87257CCC00519A98

Bill Comments

feedback