CO HB1342 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-2)
Status: Passed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-25 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-2)
Status: Passed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-25 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the requirement that interest and income derived from the deposit and investment of federal funds that the state received from the federal coronavirus state fiscal recovery fund be credited to the state emergency reserve cash fund.
Title
State Emergency Reserve Cash Fund
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1342 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 61 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1342 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1342 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 61 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1342 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-25 | Governor Signed | |
2022-04-20 | Sent to the Governor | |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2022-04-19 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Appropriations |
2022-03-31 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-03-30 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2022-03-29 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2022-03-28 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Appropriations |