CO HB1341 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 2 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-28 - House Second Reading Laid Over to 12/31/2020 - No Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-28 - House Second Reading Laid Over to 12/31/2020 - No Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning long-range planning of capital construction for state institutions of higher education.
Title
State Higher Education Capital Construction Long-range Planning
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-09 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 20-1341 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-28 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over to 12/31/2020 - No Amendments |
2020-03-14 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over to 03/30/2020 - No Amendments |
2020-03-13 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2020-03-09 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2020-03-02 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance |