CO HB1339 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-30 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-30 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning a requirement for fingerprint-based criminal history record checks for individuals with access to federal tax information, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Background Checks Employees Access Federal Tax Information
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-09 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 61 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 61 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-03 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1339, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-03 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1339, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 61 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-27 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1339, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1339, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 61 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-03 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1339, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-03 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1339, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 61 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-27 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1339, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1339, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-30 | Governor Signed | |
2018-04-24 | Sent to the Governor | |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2018-04-24 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2018-04-09 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2018-04-05 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over to 04/09/2018 |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Appropriations |
2018-03-29 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-03-28 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2018-03-27 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2018-03-26 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Appropriations |