CO HB1338 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning transfers to address the reduction of revenues in the severance tax operational fund.
Title
Reduced Revenue Severance Tax Operational Fund Transfers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-12 - House - House: Conference Committee Report Recede (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 44 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Adhere (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - CC_HB18-1338_2018A: Adopt Senate version of the bill. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - House - House: Senate Amendments Notcncr (Y: 36 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-03 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1338, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-03 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1338, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 36 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1338 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1338 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 44 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Adhere (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - CC_HB18-1338_2018A: Adopt Senate version of the bill. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - House - House: Senate Amendments Notcncr (Y: 36 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-03 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1338, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-03 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1338, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 36 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1338 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1338 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | Governor Signed | |
2018-04-26 | Sent to the Governor | |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2018-04-26 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2018-04-12 | House | House Consideration of First Conference Committee Report result was to Recede - CCR not produced |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Senate Consideration of First Conference Committee Report result was to Adhere - CCR not produced |
2018-04-09 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over to 04/09/2018 |
2018-04-09 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Not Concur - Request Conference Committee |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Appropriations |
2018-03-29 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-03-28 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2018-03-27 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2018-03-26 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Appropriations |