CO HB1338 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-06 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning a requirement for a timely hearing for a defendant in jail with a municipal court hold.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Municipal Court Bond Hold Notification and Hearing

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 17-1338 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment F). (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 17-1338, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 17-1338, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-06 Governor Signed
2017-05-18 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-18SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2017-05-17HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2017-05-09SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2017-05-08SenateSenate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2017-05-04SenateSenate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2017-05-01SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
2017-05-01HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2017-04-28HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
2017-04-27HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2017-04-25HouseHouse Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2017-04-13HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary

Subjects


Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb17-1338
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2017A/bills/2017A_1338_01.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2017A/bills/2017A_1338_eng.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2017A/bills/2017A_1338_ren.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2017A/bills/2017A_1338_rev.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2017A/bills/2017A_1338_rer.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2017A/bills/2017A_1338_enr.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2017A/bills/2017a_1338_01.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2017A/bills/2017a_1338_eng.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2017A/bills/2017a_1338_ren.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2017A/bills/2017a_1338_rev.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2017A/bills/2017a_1338_rer.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2017A/bills/2017a_1338_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hjud2017a2017-04-25t134044z-hb17-1338-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hjud2017a2017-04-25t134044z-hb17-1338-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hjud2017a2017-04-25t134044z-hb17-1338-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/2017%2520House%2520Journal.pdf#1205
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/ssa2017a2017-05-04t104016z-hb17-1338-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/2017%2520Senate%2520Journal.pdf#1181

Bill Comments

feedback