CO HB1337 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-05 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-05 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Placement Stability For Children & With Siblings
Title
Placement Stability For Children & With Siblings
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-23 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1337 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-23 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1337 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1337 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-23 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1337 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1337 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-05 | House | Governor Signed |
2015-05-01 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2015-05-01 | House | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2015-05-01 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services |
2015-04-20 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2015-04-17 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2015-04-14 | House | House Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2015-04-07 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Public Health Care & Human Services |