CO HB1336 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Enrolled on June 29 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning requiring the satisfactory completion of a course that includes Holocaust and genocide studies as a condition of high school graduation in public schools.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Holocaust And Genocide Studies In Public Schools

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1336 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 20-1336 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-05 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-04 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.004) (Y: 24 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-06-03 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1336, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-03 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1336, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 20-1336 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-29 Sent to the Governor
2020-06-29SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2020-06-29HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2020-06-10SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-06-09SenateSenate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
2020-06-09SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2020-06-08SenateSenate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2020-06-06SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
2020-06-05HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-06-04HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2020-06-03HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2020-03-12HouseHouse Committee on Education Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2020-03-02HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Education

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb20-1336
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1336_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1336_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1336_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1336_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1336_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1336_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/3fd8942e2d563eef87258529006b7518-hb20-1336-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/ddb3870faaa4c3588725857c00631fde-hb20-1336-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/ddb3870faaa4c3588725857c00631fde-hb20-1336-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb20-1336vote6ed145
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb20-1336vote04f41f
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/9b4cd4b9c174d04a87258582000d0a65-hb20-1336-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/907c3ec1aa11324187258582006a2447-hb20-1336-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb20-1336vote543e6e

Bill Comments

feedback