CO HB1336 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-30 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the repeal of the local government retail marijuana impact grant program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Repeal Local Government Retail Marijuana Impact Grant Program

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-03 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1336 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1336 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1336 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-30 Governor Signed
2018-04-26 Sent to the Governor
2018-04-26SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2018-04-26HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2018-04-05SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2018-04-04SenateSenate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
2018-04-03SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2018-04-02SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Appropriations
2018-03-29HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2018-03-28HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
2018-03-27HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2018-03-26HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Appropriations

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb18-1336
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_1336_01.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_1336_eng.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_1336_ren.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_1336_rev.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_1336_rer.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_1336_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/happ2018a2018-03-27t073712z-hb18-1336-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/happ2018a2018-03-27t073012z-hb18-1336-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/sapp2018a2018-04-03t083443z-hb18-1336-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb18-1336vote60491c
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb18-1336vote5e5f83

Bill Comments

feedback