CO HB1336 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-17 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Study Single Geographic Area Individual Hlth Plans

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Study Single Geographic Area Individual Hlth Plans

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-04-25 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 60 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-14 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.006 (Attachment H) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-14 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1336, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-14 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1336, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-01 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-24 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2016-03-24 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1336, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-17HouseGovernor Signed
2016-05-05HouseSent to the Governor
2016-05-05HouseSigned by the President of the Senate
2016-05-05HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2016-04-25HouseHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
2016-04-25HouseHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2016-04-20SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2016-04-19SenateSenate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
2016-04-14SenateSenate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2016-04-01SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services
2016-04-01HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2016-03-31HouseHouse Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
2016-03-24HouseHouse Committee on Health, Insurance, & Environment Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2016-03-02HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Health, Insurance, & Environment

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/8C90280989DF2E8487257F41005FE7A6?Open
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/8C90280989DF2E8487257F41005FE7A6/$FILE/1336_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/8C90280989DF2E8487257F41005FE7A6/$FILE/1336hie_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/8C90280989DF2E8487257F41005FE7A6/$FILE/1336_eng.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/8C90280989DF2E8487257F41005FE7A6/$FILE/1336_ren.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/8C90280989DF2E8487257F41005FE7A6/$FILE/1336shhs_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/8C90280989DF2E8487257F41005FE7A6/$FILE/1336_rev.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/8C90280989DF2E8487257F41005FE7A6/$FILE/1336_rer.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/8C90280989DF2E8487257F41005FE7A6/$FILE/1336_enr.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/8C90280989DF2E8487257F41005FE7A6/$FILE/1336_signed.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/C2FE120C30B005B987257F80007D7C8C
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/csljournals.nsf/(jouhse)/0BBD1ADEB3980AE787257F8800585A28/$FILE/Ap01.pdf#674
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/D01DA379864475BA87257F80007C0E1D
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/66C013DC924F6B8387257F950078A0D5
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/66C013DC924F6B8387257F950078A0D5
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/csljournals.nsf/(jousen)/65BD3E79BF154DEB87257F9B004D7CA3/$FILE/jour_099.pdf#796
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/D6A3D6D3ACF9B6D087257F950077431F
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/csljournals.nsf/(jouhse)/44F95D6E0A8E53D987257FA00059D3E9/$FILE/Ap25.pdf#1033

Bill Comments

feedback