CO HB1336 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-05 - Senate Committee on Appropriations Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Employment Services For Veterans And Spouses

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Employment Services For Veterans And Spouses

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-05-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Postpone House Bill 15-1336 indefinitely using a reversal of the previous roll call. There was no objection to the use of the reverse roll call, therefore, the bill was postponed indefinitely (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-05-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1336 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 3 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-05-04 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1336 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-29 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1336, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment B) with conceptual amendment (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-14 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt a conceptual amendment to amendment L.002 to redefine the definition of "spouse" to mean the "current spouse of a veteran or the former spouse of a veteran who is currently eligible for veterans benefits" (Attachment C) (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-14 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-14 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1336, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-05SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Postpone Indefinitely
2015-05-04SenateSenate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2015-04-30SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs + Appropriations
2015-04-30HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2015-04-29HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2015-04-29HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2015-04-14HouseHouse Committee on Business Affairs and Labor Refer Amended to Appropriations
2015-04-02HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs and Labor

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/BC79572C23B7171187257DFD007C25E1?Open
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/BC79572C23B7171187257DFD007C25E1/$FILE/1336_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/BC79572C23B7171187257DFD007C25E1/$FILE/1336bus_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/BC79572C23B7171187257DFD007C25E1/$FILE/1336app.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/BC79572C23B7171187257DFD007C25E1/$FILE/1336_eng.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/BC79572C23B7171187257DFD007C25E1/$FILE/1336_ren.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/C3F869EAAD862E6287257E270074BFA1
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/D3B9C2642F29E11087257E270072BE68
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/7BC65E859205E59D87257E2700749EF7
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/410DDC5D16F01E2587257E270073377D
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/262D1929C80217AF87257E270072CED5
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2015A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/FFFE95A5631D391F87257E36004EB646
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2015A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/188C1B3456AC531487257E36004EA76C
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2015A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/B3439FB14EBDF88387257E3B006D872E
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2015A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/6DDC79E1E7E60D0A87257E3C006EC9C9
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2015A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/60A3A60A19DC771487257E3C006EDF89

Bill Comments

feedback