CO HB1336 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-05 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

CDPS Expenditures School Safety

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CDPS Expenditures School Safety

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-04-26 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2010-03-26 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 10-1336 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-12 - House - FINAL VOTE - cow (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 10-1336 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-06-05 Governor Action - Signed
2010-05-25 Sent to the Governor
2010-05-25 Signed by the Speaker of the House
2010-05-25 Signed by the President of the Senate
2010-05-03 Senate Third Reading Passed
2010-04-30 Senate Second Reading Passed
2010-04-29 Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily
2010-04-26 Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2010-03-26 Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2010-03-23 Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary + Appropriations
2010-03-22 House Third Reading Passed
2010-03-19 House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments
2010-03-16 House Second Reading Laid Over to 03/19/2010
2010-03-12 House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2010-02-26 House Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2010-02-10 Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary + Appropriations

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2010a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/A9F2EB924F806F67872576B00064D6DD?Open
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2010a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/A9F2EB924F806F67872576B00064D6DD/$FILE/1336_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2010a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/A9F2EB924F806F67872576B00064D6DD/$FILE/1336_eng.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2010a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/A9F2EB924F806F67872576B00064D6DD/$FILE/1336_ren.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2010a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/A9F2EB924F806F67872576B00064D6DD/$FILE/1336_rev.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2010a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/A9F2EB924F806F67872576B00064D6DD/$FILE/1336_rer.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2010a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/A9F2EB924F806F67872576B00064D6DD/$FILE/1336_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2010A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/2D2E84FFD4F852A7872576D6007CD4D5
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2010A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/92A48BE2D45A9743872576E40052794E
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2010A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/B8B7D9EB3294CE46872576F2006DE8C6
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2010A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/1989EF7A2304DF39872577110068A519

Bill Comments

feedback