CO HB1335 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-06 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-06 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the Colorado child care assistance program, and, in connection therewith, establishing eligibility requirements for all counties and creating a new formula to determine the amount of block grants to counties.
Title
County Child Care Assistance Program Block Grants
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-26 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 53 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 62 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Amend (l.002) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 27 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 26 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1335 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 50 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-06 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-06 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1335, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 62 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Amend (l.002) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 27 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 26 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1335 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 50 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-06 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-06 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1335, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-06 | Governor Signed | |
2018-05-14 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2018-05-14 | Sent to the Governor | |
2018-05-11 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2018-04-26 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2018-04-23 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Reconsidered - No Amendments |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-04-20 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Appropriations |
2018-04-11 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-04-10 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2018-04-09 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over to 04/10/2018 - No Amendments |
2018-04-06 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over to 04/09/2018 - No Amendments |
2018-04-06 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2018-03-26 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Appropriations |