CO HB1335 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Contributions To Candidates Not Major Pol Parties
Title
Contributions To Candidates Not Major Pol Parties
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-23 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1335 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-14 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-14 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1335, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-14 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-14 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1335, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-02 | House | Governor Signed |
2014-05-01 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2014-05-01 | House | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2014-04-30 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2014-04-17 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-04-16 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2014-04-14 | House | House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2014-03-21 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |