CO HB1335 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-27 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-27 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
BOCES School Food Program
Title
BOCES School Food Program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-23 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-31 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 10-1335, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-12 - House - FINAL VOTE - cow (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-25 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 10-1335, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-03-31 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 10-1335, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-12 - House - FINAL VOTE - cow (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-25 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 10-1335, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-27 | Governor Action - Signed | |
2010-05-25 | Sent to the Governor | |
2010-05-25 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | |
2010-05-25 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2010-05-04 | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass | |
2010-04-30 | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily | |
2010-04-28 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2010-04-27 | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-04-23 | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2010-03-31 | Senate Committee on Education Refer Amended to Appropriations | |
2010-03-19 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education + Appropriations | |
2010-03-17 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2010-03-16 | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-03-12 | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2010-02-25 | House Committee on Education Refer Amended to Appropriations | |
2010-02-10 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Education + Appropriations |